Financial history MASJID-E-NOOR (BIRMINGHAM) TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 1091611
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £51.29k £35.90k £53.64k £150.98k £98.65k
Total expenditure £57.72k £20.53k £18.56k £30.87k £61.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.02k N/A N/A N/A