Victory Church Wallasey

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Activities Education/Training Relief of Poverty Religious activities and Ministry
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
- Wirral
- Kenya
- Rwanda
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- 23 March 2001: Standard registration
- HOPE SCHOOL (Working name)
- VICTORY CHURCH WALLASEY TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beatrice Lubyayi | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev WILLIAM KASAIJA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NEIL RUSSEL HARDISTY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.95k | £9.85k | £9.85k | £9.90k | £9.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.92k | £9.85k | £9.80k | £9.90k | £9.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 16 January 2025 | 345 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 16 January 2025 | 710 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 24 October 2022 | 260 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 24 October 2022 | 625 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17 FEBRUARY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 13 DECEMBER 2000 as amended on 02 May 2020
Charitable objects
A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN WALLASEY AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD A THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 HAYDOCK ROAD
WALLASEY
CH45 7QX
- Phone:
- 07367358640
- Email:
- wkasaija@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window