TAUNTON SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing education for girls and boys age 2 to 18 both day and boarding. Adding the maximum value to help most pupils achieve excellent exam results and enabling all to maximise their potential. Helping pupils to be 'Ready for Life' through many co-curricular activities including; debating, music, drama and sport.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£29,190,000
Donations and legacies | £441.30k | |
Charitable activities | £25.71m | |
Other trading activities | £1.78m | |
Investments | £105.30k | |
Other | £1.16m |
Total expenditure:
£27,570,900
Raising funds | £731.80k | |
Charitable activities | £26.84m | |
Other | £0 |
-£19,200 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £731.80k | |
Charitable expenditure | £26.84m | |
Retained for future use | £1.62m |
People

628 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 9 |
£70k to £80k | 6 |
£90k to £100k | 2 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£140k to £150k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 22 July 2002: Standard registration
- TAUNTON SCHOOL (Working name)
- TAUNTON SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL CHARITY (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Anderson | Chair | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Anne Hazell | Trustee | 30 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shirlene Adam | Trustee | 22 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Shayler | Trustee | 09 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Mervyn Pyke | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dinah Close | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julian Peter Whiteley | Trustee | 03 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Majella Wheeler | Trustee | 05 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Kelham DL | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|||||
David Hugh Hebditch | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rear Admiral Ian Moncrieff CBE DL | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
REV Nigel Carl Manges | Trustee | 01 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Robert Charles Aldrich | Trustee | 11 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Philip Michael Cooper BAHonsMSc | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Richard Kennedy | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.49m | £20.93m | £21.18m | £25.33m | £29.19m | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.00m | £21.69m | £21.28m | £23.81m | £27.57m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £324.60k | £164.50k | £196.30k | £208.70k | £441.30k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £717.90k | £587.50k | £1.07m | £1.38m | £1.78m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £21.38m | £19.95m | £18.96m | £22.61m | £25.71m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £69.00k | £231.50k | £198.20k | £63.60k | £105.30k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £753.80k | £1.06m | £1.16m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £196.30k | £208.70k | £441.30k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £21.64m | £21.34m | £20.78m | £23.26m | £26.84m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £359.30k | £349.00k | £496.30k | £553.10k | £731.80k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £184.90k | £184.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £278.90k | £105.90k | £90.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £22.04m | £25.07m | £24.63m | £25.94m | £26.21m | |
|
Long-term investments | £4.65m | £4.52m | £5.31m | £5.15m | £5.07m | |
|
Other assets | £3.15m | £1.02m | £1.33m | £1.93m | £3.96m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | -£290.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £11.71m | £13.32m | £13.37m | £13.83m | £14.44m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 07 September 2020 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 07 September 2020 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 JUN 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 JUL 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 MAR 2016 as amended on 04 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
3.1 TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF A SCHOOL OR SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE GOVERNORS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT: 3.1.1. IN ADMITTING PUPILS TO THE SCHOOL, THE GOVERNORS MUST EXERCISE (ALL OTHER THINGS BEING EQUAL) A PREFERENCE IN FAVOUR OF SONS AND DAUGHTERS OF MEMBERS OF THE FREE CHURCHES; AND 3.1.2. IN CARRYING OUT ITS OBJECTS, THE CHARITY SHALL UPHOLD THE FOUNDING PRINCIPLES OF THE SCHOOL WHICH ARE ROOTED IN THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND RECOGNISE THE PARTICULAR EMPHASIS OF ITS FREE CHURCH FOUNDATION ON THE IMPORTANCE OF PERSONAL RESPONSIBILITY IN THE QUEST FOR FAITH, AND RESPECT FOR ALL RELIGIOUS TRADITIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Linked charities
- 22 July 2002 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
TAUNTON SCHOOL
STAPLEGROVE ROAD
TAUNTON
TA2 6AD
- Phone:
- 01823703128
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window