THE COVENTRY MEDICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1084838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the study and general knowledge of science and medicine in Coventry and Warwickshire and to promote medical fellowship in the Coventry and Rugby area

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,530
Total expenditure: £2,783

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Coventry City
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 January 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE COVENTRY MEDICAL SOCIETY (Working name)
  • COVENTRY AND WARWICKSHIRE MEDICAL EDUCATION CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Maisun Elftise Trustee 10 October 2023
None on record
Dr Vinod Menon Trustee 13 October 2021
None on record
Dr Sailesh Sankar Trustee 25 January 2019
None on record
Maria Alice Morris Trustee 24 January 2019
None on record
Anthony Thomas Trustee 08 October 2013
None on record
Dr ANTHONY NISHAN WIRATUNGA Trustee 07 November 2012
None on record
KIERAN PAUL JEFFERSON Trustee 07 November 2012
None on record
Dr ANDREW ILCHYSHN Trustee
None on record
Dr CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL TAGGART Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £64.87k £17.79k £215 £754 £1.53k
Total expenditure £42.33k £16.43k £9.72k £22.79k £2.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 January 2024 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 November 2022 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 December 2020 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 December 2020 51 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Azets Holdings Ltd
3Mc Middlemarch Business Park
Siskin Drive
COVENTRY
CV3 4FJ
Phone:
02476713729
Website:

No information available