Trustees THE COVENTRY MEDICAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1084838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Maisun Elftise Trustee 10 October 2023
None on record
Dr Vinod Menon Trustee 13 October 2021
None on record
Dr Sailesh Sankar Trustee 25 January 2019
None on record
Maria Alice Morris Trustee 24 January 2019
None on record
Anthony Thomas Trustee 08 October 2013
None on record
Dr ANTHONY NISHAN WIRATUNGA Trustee 07 November 2012
None on record
KIERAN PAUL JEFFERSON Trustee 07 November 2012
None on record
Dr ANDREW ILCHYSHN Trustee
None on record
Dr CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL TAGGART Trustee
None on record