BULMER VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide and maintain the village hall for use of the inhabitants of Bulmer and the neighbourhood without political, religious or other opinions. The hall to be used for meetings, lectures & classes & other forms of recreation with the object of improving conditions of life for the said inhabitants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 28 January 2002: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Paxton | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Kenson | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stella Buchanan | Trustee | 24 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christina Morley | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Denise Vicos | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
William Dixey | Trustee | 26 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET SKIPPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS RAWLINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.83k | £29.36k | £12.11k | £4.60k | £5.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.24k | £7.39k | £10.49k | £6.56k | £5.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.38k | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME MADE BT THE SECRETARY OF STATE FOR EDUCATION AND SCIENCE UNDER SECTION '8' OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1960 SEALED 18TH JUNE 1969.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE FOUNDATION SHALL BE THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF BULMER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 VICARS ORCHARD
BULMER
SUDBURY
CO10 7TB
- Phone:
- 01787374758
- Email:
- skipper87@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
N./A
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window