MALCOLM X COMMUNITY CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Malcolm X Centre Ltd primary purpose is to provide social, recreational, educational, entertainment facilities to the inhabitants of St.Pauls and surrounding areas, with particular emphasis on service delivery to the African and African Caribbean communities. Jamafrique Social Club is the trading and entertainment arm of the MXCC. Jamafrique gift aids profits to the Centre
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £13,887 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bristol City
Governance
- 10 June 2003: Standard registration
- MX COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashley Burrowes | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nardia Ferguson | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Taylor | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oluwatosin Shittu | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jade Royal | Trustee | 26 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.21k | £142.02k | £184.91k | £136.96k | £153.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £101.52k | £127.34k | £162.80k | £158.94k | £173.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £114.58k | £130.33k | N/A | £13.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 February 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
17 February 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 JUNE 1992
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ST PAUL'S, ST AGNES, ST WERBURGHS, MONTPELIER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND GOOD RACE RELATIONS BY ELIMINATING DISCRIMINATION ON GROUNDS OF RACE AND ENCOURAGING EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS, AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE, OR TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF THE CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENTS BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
ST PAULS, ST AGNES, ST WERBURGHS, MONTPELIER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Malcolm X Community Centre
141 City Road
BRISTOL
BS2 8YH
- Phone:
- 01179554497
- Email:
- info@malcolmx.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window