Trustees FRIENDS OF GRANGE SCHOOL (FROGS)
Charity Number: 1080872

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kelly Hilton | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Ballantyne | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nipa Amin | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Leigh Brook | Trustee | 26 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Crystal Davis | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Whitman | Trustee | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Kennaugh | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.