THE CHELLS SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a scout group we actively encourage adventurous activity, self reliance and development of good citizenship to a large mixed membership. Through these activities we also educate youngsters in environmental conservation and develop their spiritual and cultural awareness within the policies and objectives of the UK Scout Association.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 30 May 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Sephton | Chair | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rita Cooper | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Rose | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
JASON WILKES | Trustee | 02 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH CROWLEY | Trustee | 02 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
wendy vaughan | Trustee | 01 December 1998 |
|
|
||||
COLIN WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAM ROGERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MIKE CROWLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR BOB WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN BURNS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.16k | £13.50k | £9.55k | £11.16k | £11.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.82k | £6.04k | £6.41k | £7.82k | £8.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 February 2025 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 August 2024 | 184 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 August 2024 | 549 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 August 2024 | 914 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 July 2024 | 1277 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL AGES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
93 BROAD OAK WAY
STEVENAGE
SG2 8RB
- Phone:
- 01438236749
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window