Accounts and annual returns THE CANCER CURE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1084793
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2018 26 September 2019 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 11 April 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 27 June 2017 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required