Accounts and annual returns THOMAS GAUGHAN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1081466
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2013 06 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2013 06 May 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 03 July 2013 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 03 July 2013 153 days late
Annual return 31 March 2011 29 November 2012 303 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 29 November 2012 303 days late