ALLENDALE CHILDRENS THEATRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
May provide workshops and rehearsals for production later in the year
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Northumberland
Governance
- 06 September 2000: Standard registration
- 25 March 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/05/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.93k | £1.42k | £0 | £2.16k | £2.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.76k | £2.24k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 20 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 15 February 2010 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 14 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2007 | 17 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2007 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 MARCH 1998 AS AMENDED 2 MARCH 2000 FURTHER AMENDED 29 JULY 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN ALLERDALE AND DISTRICT IN THE ART OF THEATRE AND PERFORMANCE IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF WORKSHOPS AND A CHILDREN'S THEATRE
Area of benefit
ALLENDALE AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window