NACTON SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the pupils in the school. Develop more extended relationship between the staff, parents and other associated with the school. Engage in activities which support the school & advance the education of the pupils attending it, provide and assist in the provision of such facilities or items for education of the school (not provided) by statutory funds.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Suffolk
Governance
- 06 October 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Parratt | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julie Paton | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
sheena king mrs | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.96k | £2.52k | £2.83k | £2.41k | £5.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.08k | £3.44k | £2.32k | £2.02k | £4.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 17 December 2024 | 200 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 14 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 26 July 2020 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 OCTOBER 1999 AS AMENDED 21 SEPTEMBER 2000.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECTIVE THE ASSOCIATION MAY: A. DEVELOP MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL. B. ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT. C. PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH FACILITIES OR ITEMS FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT PROVIDED FROM STATUTORY FUNDS) AS THE COMMITTEE IN CONSULTATION WITH THE GOVERNING BODY SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NACTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NACTON SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
C/O NACTON CEVC PRIMARY SCHOOL
THE STREET
NACTON
SUFFOLK
IP10 0EU
- Phone:
- 01473659370
- Email:
- admin@nacton.suffolk.sch.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window