WE ARE CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dissemination of information about Christianity and Roman Catholic teaching and tradition in particular Supporting individuals in the practice of their faith Providing networking opportunities for groups and individuals Networking and sharing information and ideas with other groups in the UK and overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 September 2000: Standard registration
- 02 February 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20 | £20 | £10 | £30 | £35 | |
|
Total expenditure | £675 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 30 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 24 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 17 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 29 AUGUST 2000.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG THE MEMBERSHIP OF THE CATHOLIC CHURCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, WORLDWIDE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window