Accounts and annual returns CROSS CHEQUE TRAINING

Charity number: 1081775
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 October 2011 10 February 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2010 01 February 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2010 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2009 05 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 October 2008 02 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 October 2008 Not Required