Financial history CROSS CHEQUE TRAINING

Charity Number: 1081775
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/10/2007 30/10/2008 30/10/2009 30/10/2010 30/10/2011
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £500
Total expenditure £30 £0 £0 £0 £642
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A