CROSS CHEQUE TRAINING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Objects are; For the relief of persons in need in Essex & elsewhere by providing in accordance with Christian principles, free advice, information and other assistance for those in debt or who have other financial problems.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 31 July 2000: Standard registration
- 14 February 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CCT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2007 | 30/10/2008 | 30/10/2009 | 30/10/2010 | 30/10/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £30 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £642 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2011 | 10 February 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2010 | 01 February 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2009 | 05 February 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2008 | 02 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 23 JULY 2000
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS IN NEED IN ESSEX AND ELSEWHERE BY PROVIDING, IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES, FREE ADVICE, INFORMATION, COUNSELLING AND OTHER ASSISTANCE FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN DEBT OR WHO HAVE OTHER FINANCIAL PROBLEMS.
Area of benefit
ESSEX AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window