AL-KARIM INTERNATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
education community services including to the elderly relief for those in need
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2010
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 12 January 2001: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SAMEER SALEEM BASTONI | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ABDULLAH O'TOOLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AZIM ULLAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABDERRAHMAN RAMDANI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ZOUBIR RAMDANI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2004 | 30/04/2006 | 30/04/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135 | £222 | £159 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12 | £0 | £13 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 84 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 449 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 449 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 815 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 815 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1180 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1180 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1545 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1545 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 DECEMBER 2000.
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF ISLAMIC RELIGION, IN ACCORDANCE WITH TEACHINGS OF ISLAM AS PRESCRIBED IN QURAN AND THE SUNNAH OF THE LAST PROPHET, MUHAMMAD (PEACE BE UPON HIM) 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN IN NEED 3) TO RELIEF OF POVERTY
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
- No information available
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window