SIERRA LEONE WAR TRUST FOR CHILDREN

Charity number: 1085628
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

SLWT works through partnerships to promote education, health, rehabilitation and self-sufficiency of children and youth in Sierra Leone through advocacy and the provision of financial and technical support

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £8,104
Total expenditure: £7,853

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Sierra Leone

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 March 2001: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SLWT (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
IBRAHIM SHEAKA KABIA Chair
None on record
RENEE SERENA HORTON-COKER Trustee 30 April 1999
None on record
FELNA ANN FOX Trustee
None on record
DENNIS RONALD GREENE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £48.15k £14.38k £24.70k £10.73k £8.10k
Total expenditure £31.65k £29.94k £20.75k £15.16k £7.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 19 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 29 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 March 2022 136 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 November 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 16 March 2022 501 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 THORNTON ROAD
POTTERS BAR
EN6 1JJ
Phone:
01707663663
Email:
info@slwt.org