THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF WRITING
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's purpose is to establish & support a new teaching institution, The National Academy of Writing ("NAW"), which gives students the skills, knowledge and confidence to develop their careers as professional writers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 September 2000: Standard registration
- 25 August 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.30k | £55.02k | £13.17k | £30.95k | £45.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.11k | £48.24k | £43.16k | £42.15k | £44.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | 24 November 2015 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | 23 November 2015 | 116 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 31 July 2014 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | 26 June 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 29 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 JANUARY 2000.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART AND PRACTICE OF WRITING, INCLUDING THE WRITING OF FICTION, NON-FICTION AND DRAMA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window