SALISBURY CITY AMATEUR BOXING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Amateur Boxing Club within Salisbury Area. Both a thriving Junior and Adult Club within the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 11 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 10 July 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR RAY SPARROW | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Eddie Mcdickson | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 11/08/2019 | 11/08/2020 | 11/08/2021 | 11/08/2022 | 11/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.59k | £7.35k | £16.32k | £7.31k | £14.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.44k | £9.49k | £9.94k | £11.21k | £15.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £9.43k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 11 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 August 2022 | 01 July 2023 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 August 2021 | 15 July 2022 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 August 2020 | 03 August 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 11 August 2019 | 13 April 2021 | 306 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 11 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MAY 2000.
Charitable objects
1) TO HELP EDUCATE YOUNG PERSONS OF EITHER SEX LIVING IN SALISBURY AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT, BY USING THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES WITH THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS IN MIND. A) TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL CAPABILITIES SO THAT THEY MAY GROW INTO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. B) THAT THEIR CONDITION AND QUALITY OF LIFE MAY IMPROVE WITH EMPHASIS ON THE TEACHING OF AMATEUR BOXING. 2) TO PROVIDE THE FUNDS WHERE BY THEIR OBJECTS LISTED ABOVE CAN SUCCESSFULLY COME TO FRUITION.
Area of benefit
SALISBURY AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
salisbury boxing club
brunel road
churchfields industrial estate
salisbury
wiltshire
sp2 7pu
- Phone:
- 07565828843
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window