Financial history THE LEICESTER U3A

Charity number: 1083274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £8.28k £6.70k £6.25k £7.41k £12.31k
Total expenditure £8.06k £138 £5.23k £11.14k £12.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A