Financial history SUNDERLAND NORTH FAMILY ZONE

Charity number: 1082558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £60.02k £100.13k £171.65k £47.97k £107.94k
Total expenditure £62.84k £73.48k £116.32k £94.43k £106.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £18.94k £10.74k N/A N/A