Trustees SUNDERLAND NORTH FAMILY ZONE

Charity number: 1082558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
James Procopis Chair 07 April 2025
None on record
Stephen Lounton Trustee 10 April 2025
None on record
Karen Brown Trustee 08 April 2025
None on record
Lee Brown Trustee 01 April 2025
None on record
Sarah Robson Trustee 22 March 2024
None on record
lynne robinson Trustee 01 February 2021
None on record
Judith Potelle Trustee 01 April 2013
None on record
JANET TATE Trustee 01 April 2013
None on record
ANNE MORRISON Trustee
SUNDERLAND MIND
Received: On time