NORTHALLERTON AND DISTRICT CENTRE FOR THE DEAF

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SAME LAST TIME
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 18 November 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CATHY FARQUHAR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Charles Clark | Trustee | 12 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAWN CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 03/03/2020 | 03/03/2021 | 03/03/2022 | 03/03/2023 | 03/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.71k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £20 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.00k | £0 | £0 | £119 | £89 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 March 2024 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 March 2023 | 09 August 2024 | 219 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 03 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED 29 SEPTEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING PEOPLE RESIDENT IN NORTHALLERTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY ADVANCEMENT OF THEIR EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PEOPLE
Area of benefit
NORTHALLERTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 SOUTH CRESCENT
SOWERBY
THIRSK
YO7 1QZ
- Phone:
- 01845523689
- Email:
- 23charliedawn@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window