Financial history START

Charity number: 1082104
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2004 30/06/2005 30/06/2006 30/06/2007 30/06/2008
Total gross income £204.83k £213.14k £207.25k £71.96k £188.70k
Total expenditure £15.87k £25.14k £20.81k £28.16k £44.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A