Trustees BLACK COUNTRY ORTHODOX TRUST
Charity number: 1082272

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brandon Scott-Omenka | Chair | 15 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steven Rollins | Trustee | 19 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Florin Mihaila | Trustee | 19 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Irina Elena Rollins | Trustee | 11 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tatiana Vasiliou | Trustee | 11 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gregory Wittwer | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARIANA MIHAELA ISPAS | Trustee | 23 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Florina Alina Clewer | Trustee | 17 July 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.