SKIPTON AND CRAVEN ACTION FOR DISABILITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides for the welfare of people with disabilities living in and around Craven, North Yorkshire and assisting them to integrate into society. We operate 8 minibuses with full disability access including wheelchair lifts. We collect them from their homes and take them to Doctors & Hospital appointments, Dentists, Shopping etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Cumbria
- Kirklees
- Lancashire
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 19 June 2002: Standard registration
- 01 September 2022: Funds received from 702241 AGE CONCERN HELLIFIELD CLUB
- SCAD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD PETER CLARKE | Chair | 18 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Ken Creek | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Anne Morley | Trustee | 25 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA ELIZABETH MAY WATSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £381.86k | £373.13k | £368.72k | £251.91k | £253.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £336.11k | £443.04k | £416.90k | £253.39k | £254.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £16.00k | £15.24k | £20.17k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £10.50k | £3.31k | £118.44k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 MAY 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 19 MARCH 2002 AND 30 APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE AND RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF DISABLED PERSONS RESIDENT IN AND ADJACENT TO THE DISTRICT OF CRAVEN AND TO ASSIST THEIR INTEGRATION INTO SOCIETY
Area of benefit
DISTRICT OF CRAVEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ms Stephanie Wheelhouse
46-48 NEWMARKET STREET
SKIPTON
NORTH YORKSHIRE
BD23 2JB
- Phone:
- 01756701005
- Email:
- info@scad.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window