THE COOPERS' COMPANY AND COBORN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION PRIZE FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides annual form and subject prizes for pupils of the Coopers' Coborn School. Total cost of prizes exceeds the income of this small charity, the balance being found from the general funds of the educational foundation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Havering
Governance
- 16 June 2000: Standard registration
- 06 March 2009: Removed
- 06 March 2009: Funds transferred to 310935 THE COOPERS' COMPANY AND COBORN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDA...
- COOPERS' COBORN PRIZE FUND (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £824 | £1.08k | £1.76k | £1.17k | £1.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £824 | £1.08k | £1.76k | £1.17k | £1.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 08 April 2009 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 08 April 2009 | 433 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 31 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 02 December 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 11 August 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 APRIL 2000.
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF BURSARIES AND PRIZES FOR PUPILS OF THE COOPERS' COMPANY AND COBORN SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
COOPERS' COMPANY AND COBORN SCHOOL, UPMINSTER.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window