HILL CLOSE GARDENS TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Restoration and maintenance of 16 Victorian detached garden plots in Warwick for the benefit of the townspeople of Warwick and the nation at large.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £25,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 28 February 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Jane Haughton | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Cathcart | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Wainwright | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Eddy | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Vivian Bleasdale | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER LAMB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEORGE HENRY CHRISTOPHER BEGG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £215.63k | £131.96k | £152.55k | £130.57k | £155.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £176.58k | £195.60k | £204.37k | £202.99k | £229.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £20.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.00k | £37.50k | £76.20k | £29.25k | £25.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 APRIL 2000
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND RESTORE FOR THE EDUCATION BENEFIT AND ENJOYMENT OF THE TOWN PEOPLE OF WARWICK IN THE COUNTY OF WARWICKSHIRE AND OF THE NATION AT LARGE WHATEVER OF THE HISTORIC HERITAGE WHICH MAY EXIST IN AND AROUND THE HILL CLOSE GARDENS WARWICK IN THE FORM OF GARDENS OR OTHER OBJECTS OF PARTICULAR BEAUTY OR HISTORICAL OR CONSTRUCTIONAL INTEREST
Area of benefit
WARWICK
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILL CLOSE GARDENS VISITOR CENTRE
BREAD AND MEAT CLOSE
WARWICK
CV34 6HF
- Phone:
- 01926493339
- Email:
- centremanager@hcgt.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window