Financial history FIELDS CHURCH

Charity number: 1082134
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £82.22k £108.03k £89.28k £108.51k £101.93k
Total expenditure £79.71k £92.74k £79.21k £88.84k £101.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A