THE WESTERN FRONT ASSOCIATION (ESSEX BRANCH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To further interest in the period 1914 to 1918 and to perpetuate the memory, courage and comradeship of those on all sides who served their countries during the Great War. This is achieved by monthly meetings and talks on aspects of the Great War, a periodic newsletter and assisting with information and finance for new and existing memorial conservation and Great War educational projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Essex
Governance
- 19 January 2001: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JIM KEVANY | Chair | 31 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Charles Steer | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
BOB COPSEY | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
KAREN JUDITH DENNIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL BAXTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRAHAM ROBERT STARLING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN THOMAS WICKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.05k | £539 | £409 | £1.14k | £1.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.46k | £1.81k | £709 | £1.37k | £1.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MAIN ASSOCIATION CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 NOVEMBER 1987 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28 MARCH 1998
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF THE GREAT WAR WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE WESTERN FRONT
Area of benefit
ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
128 Gordon Road
BASILDON
Essex
SS14 1PR
- Phone:
- 01268450963
- Email:
- jimkev@blueyonder.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window