LATIN AMERICAN SOCIAL FUND 2000 PLUS

Charity number: 1099504
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supporting the Latin American Community with information and general help in issues that affect them such as welfare, housing, translation, interpreting

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £175
Total expenditure: £110

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 September 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Latinos Help Centro (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LEONARDO FABIO Chair
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £140 £140 £100 £0 £175
Total expenditure £0 £0 £75 £0 £110
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 April 2025 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 April 2024 89 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 02 March 2023 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 04 February 2022 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2022 369 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
LATIN AMERICAN SOCIAL FUND
WORCESTER HOUSE
100 KENNINGTON ROAD
LONDON
SE11 6LS
Phone:
02072071500
Website:

No information available