Financial history DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INTERVENTION PROJECT

Charity number: 1083549
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £1.36m £1.65m £1.78m £2.02m £1.84m
Total expenditure £1.48m £1.61m £1.80m £2.04m £2.05m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £890.72k £1.12m £811.44k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £67.40k £30.71k £54.35k
Income - Donations and legacies £701.75k £1.05m £1.24m £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £660.69k £601.69k £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £539.28k £664.51k £460.95k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.07k £123 £10 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £1.36m £1.38m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.48m £1.61m £1.80m £2.04m £2.05m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.19k £4.09k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0