TRIUMPHANT CHURCH INTERNATIONAL - DESTINY MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As described in the Trust Deed: To advance the Christian faith and to pursue such other charitable activities, as the Trustees shall from time to time deem fit. These objects are embodied in our six (6) main areas of operation o Spiritual and Vibrant weekly services o Outreach Programmes o Missionary/ Missions work o Media Ministry o Annual Programme and Conferences o Training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Ghana
- Kenya
- Netherlands
- Nigeria
- South Africa
- Spain
- Switzerland
Governance
- 24 November 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REVEREND CLEMENT ESOMOWEI | Chair | 19 September 1999 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Olubunmi Titilayo Olojo | Trustee | 26 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev ONENGIYE MARJORIE ESOMOWEI | Trustee | 19 September 1999 |
|
|
||||
SAMSON OGUNJIMI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £330.11k | £270.54k | £286.77k | £2.85m | £293.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £299.19k | £194.56k | £262.82k | £360.81k | £422.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £263.95k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.14k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £360.81k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 July 2024 | 167 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 July 2024 | 167 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 April 2023 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 April 2023 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 August 2022 | 189 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 August 2022 | 189 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 September 2021 | 215 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 September 2021 | 215 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED 14TH MARCH 2000 AS AMENDED 8TH JANUARY 2004 AS AMENDED ON 26 JAN 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND TO PURSUE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 Chislehurst Road
ORPINGTON
Kent
BR6 0DG
- Phone:
- 01689811957
- Email:
- admin@triumphant.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window