Financial history EMMER GREEN PRE-SCHOOL

Charity number: 1087387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £100.33k £89.41k £80.94k £89.62k £115.38k
Total expenditure £108.05k £108.42k £84.64k £92.03k £92.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £58.15k £65.37k £53.06k £51.77k £84.44k