Accounts and annual returns GREENSIDE MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity Number: 1084617
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 July 2020 173 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 July 2020 538 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 July 2020 903 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required