OPEN GATE

Charity Number: 1081701
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Open Gate is a small charity supporting grass roots environmental, land-based and sustainable projects. Those advancing social equality and fairness and those designed to become self-supporting are viewed favourably. Individuals and charities based overseas are not supported. In the UK applications from charities working in the North Midlands are particularly welcomed.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2021

Total income: £7,721
Total expenditure: £221,572

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Derby City
  • Derbyshire
  • Leicester City
  • Leicestershire
  • Nottingham City
  • Nottinghamshire
  • Sheffield City
  • Staffordshire
  • Stoke-on-trent City
  • Afghanistan
  • Albania
  • Algeria
  • Angola
  • Antigua And Barbuda
  • Argentina
  • Armenia
  • Azerbaijan
  • Bangladesh
  • Barbados
  • Belarus
  • Belize
  • Benin
  • Bhutan
  • Bolivia
  • Botswana
  • Brazil
  • Burkina Faso
  • Burma
  • Burundi
  • Cambodia
  • Cameroon
  • Central African Republic
  • Chad
  • Chile
  • Colombia
  • Congo
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • Costa Rica
  • Cuba
  • Djibouti
  • Dominica
  • Dominican Republic
  • East Timor
  • Ecuador
  • Egypt
  • El Salvador
  • Equatorial Guinea
  • Eritrea
  • Ethiopia
  • Fiji
  • Gabon
  • Georgia
  • Ghana
  • Grenada
  • Guatemala
  • Guinea
  • Guinea-bissau
  • Guyana
  • Haiti
  • Honduras
  • India
  • Indonesia
  • Iran
  • Iraq
  • Israel
  • Ivory Coast
  • Jamaica
  • Jordan
  • Kazakhstan
  • Kenya
  • Kyrgyzstan
  • Laos
  • Lebanon
  • Macedonia
  • Madagascar
  • Malawi
  • Malaysia
  • Mali
  • Mauritania
  • Mauritius
  • Mexico
  • Moldova
  • Mongolia
  • Montenegro
  • Morocco
  • Mozambique
  • Namibia
  • Nauru
  • Nepal
  • Nicaragua
  • Niger
  • Nigeria
  • Occupied Palestinian Territories
  • Pakistan
  • Palau
  • Panama
  • Papua New Guinea
  • Paraguay
  • Peru
  • Philippines
  • Romania
  • Rwanda
  • Samoa
  • Senegal
  • Serbia
  • Sierra Leone
  • Somalia
  • South Africa
  • South Korea
  • Sri Lanka
  • Sudan
  • Suriname
  • Syria
  • Tajikistan
  • Tanzania
  • Thailand
  • The Gambia
  • Trinidad And Tobago
  • Tunisia
  • Turkmenistan
  • Uganda
  • Ukraine
  • Uruguay
  • Uzbekistan
  • Venezuela
  • Vietnam
  • Yemen
  • Zambia
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 July 2000: Standard registration
  • 21 January 2025: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £54.20k £48.29k £26.25k £11.53k £7.72k
Total expenditure £229.49k £229.86k £205.77k £196.20k £221.57k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 478 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 843 days
Annual return 05 April 2021 28 March 2022 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window