Financial history SHERBORNE SCHOOLS GROUP

Charity number: 1081228
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £25.59m £28.89m £25.13m £26.76m £29.38m
Total expenditure £24.78m £24.43m £25.42m £27.31m £29.31m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.12m £1.17m £15.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.99m £6.92m £791.00k £584.00k £358.00k
Income - Other trading activities £1.08m £428.00k £849.00k £935.00k £1.25m
Income - Charitable activities £21.92m £21.02m £22.95m £24.42m £26.94m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £485.00k £385.00k £343.00k £393.00k £456.00k
Income - Other £113.00k £146.00k £201.00k £429.00k £369.00k
Income - Legacies £321.00k £196.00k £36.00k £161.00k £81.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £23.72m £23.74m £24.38m £26.26m £28.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.06m £691.00k £1.03m £1.05m £1.31m
Expenditure - Governance £140.00k £237.00k £88.00k £147.00k £618.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £28.00k £28.00k £29.00k £29.00k £29.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0