Financial history WOLSINGHAM AND WEAR VALLEY AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 1082095
Charity reporting is up to date (212 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £284.80k £27.50k £324.23k £405.00k £434.25k
Total expenditure £217.90k £36.42k £189.66k £309.00k £313.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A