Trustees VISUAL ART NETWORK

Charity number: 1087383
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Philip Andrew Langstaff Chair 03 May 2018
None on record
Alison Wragg Trustee 16 January 2025
None on record
David Thompson Trustee 16 January 2025
None on record
Janice Gill Trustee 19 June 2024
None on record
Reg Lewis Trustee 21 September 2023
None on record
Pat Simon Trustee 21 September 2023
None on record
Julie Goldthorpe Trustee 19 July 2022
None on record