FRIENDS OF GREENWOOD INFANT AND NURSERY SCHOOL (F.O.G.I.N.S.)

Charity number: 1081801
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund raising in aid of Edale Rise Primary and Nursery School includes Winter and Summer Fairs and smaller activities throughout the year.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £562
Total expenditure: £208

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Nottingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 August 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • F.O.G.I.N.S. (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Zoe Pieniazek Trustee 04 September 2023
None on record
PAULA SUSAN TODD Trustee
None on record
CAROLYN FREEMAN Trustee
None on record
ANEESA ISAT Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £961 £0 £237 £1.06k £562
Total expenditure £484 £0 £0 £734 £208
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 November 2023 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 06 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 February 2022 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 26 November 2020 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
EDALE RISE PRIMARY & NURSERY SCHOOL
EDALE ROAD
NOTTINGHAM
NG2 4HT
Phone:
01159150180
Website:

No information available