ST GEORGE'S THEATRE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity manages and operates St George's Theatre, housed in a Grade I listed former chapel, together with the neighbouring Pavilion cafe bar and outside performance area, to provide a balanced and broad range of cultural activities including theatre, cinema, performing arts, comedy, and music for the whole community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £61,414 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 27 July 2000: Standard registration
- ST GEORGES THEATRE (Working name)
- ST GEORGE'S ARTS CENTRE TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVEN CHARLES SCOTT | Chair | 20 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Ryan Harry Pickering | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon Andrew Hood | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £277.54k | £234.36k | £183.33k | £242.10k | £274.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £257.62k | £98.60k | £213.25k | £272.12k | £329.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £45.00k | £25.00k | £17.18k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £36.50k | £185.90k | £97.80k | £29.90k | £61.41k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 February 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/04/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/01/2013 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26/02/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/02/2016
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE ARTS AND TO IMPROVE AND DEVELOP PUBLIC TASTE, APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE ARTS IN GREAT YARMOUTH AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
GREAT YARMOUTH AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Georges Theatre
King Street
GREAT YARMOUTH
NR30 2PG
- Phone:
- 01493331484
- Email:
- admin@stgeorgestheatre.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window