Financial history KINGS CHURCH CENTRE, LEWES

Charity number: 1081337
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £253.10k £242.64k £245.02k £282.20k £315.09k
Total expenditure £234.88k £198.76k £222.16k £244.80k £278.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £9.00k N/A