Trustees TESTON LAND CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity Number: 1082554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER RONALD COULLING Chair
TESTON VILLAGE GREEN, A PUBLIC PLAYGROUND
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF TESTON CHURCH
Recently registered
Benjamin Merchant Trustee 12 March 2024
None on record
Robert Ayling Trustee 30 January 2024
TESTON VILLAGE GREEN, A PUBLIC PLAYGROUND
Received: On time
TESTON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
Tina Yuen Burgon Trustee 24 January 2017
None on record
NINA MAY WHEAT Trustee 11 August 2013
FRIENDS OF TESTON CHURCH
Recently registered
TESTON VILLAGE GREEN, A PUBLIC PLAYGROUND
Received: On time
TESTON VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
CHRIS DOUGLASS Trustee 21 May 2012
None on record
JOHN ROBIN OWENS Trustee 14 December 2011
TESTON VILLAGE GREEN, A PUBLIC PLAYGROUND
Received: On time
ROGER WILLIAM LEVETT Trustee
None on record
ALAN PERKINS Trustee
None on record