SOUTH SUDANESE EAST BANK COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our current activities include the provision of practical support to refugees and asylum seekers from the Sudanese Community living in the UK, as most of them experience problems of adjusting to a different culture, language difficulties to access basic services such as health, education, housing, training and employment. We help families, children and young people to improve their lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- South Sudan
- Uganda
Governance
- 18 May 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Agorot Bol Deng | Trustee | 15 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rowenna Koryang | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
AMBROSE SUNDAY KORYANG | Trustee | 02 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.15k | £14.87k | £9.57k | £21.25k | £21.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.44k | £16.52k | £11.16k | £11.46k | £11.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 September 2022 | 226 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 July 2021 | 169 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH JULY 2000
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE OF EAST BANK SUDANESE DESCENT, IN PARTICULAR REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS, BOTH IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING ADVICE, REPRESENTATION, TRANSLATING AND INTERPRETING SERVICES IN MATTERS SUCH AS ASYLUM AND IMMIGRATION, WELFARE BENEFITS, HOUSING, HEALTH EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE OF SOUTH SUDANESE DESCENT, IN PARTICULAR REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS, IN ORDER TO ASSIST THEIR INCLUSION IN THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
5th Floor C/O Women's Consortium
Quayside Tower
252-260 Broad Street
BIRMINGHAM
B1 2HF
- Phone:
- 07950477586
- Email:
- ask@askidentity.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window