MAURITIAN MARATHI SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SOCIAL, RELIGIOUS AND CULTURAL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 26 October 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SURESH GUNPUTHRAO | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MR CHAND DOONDEEA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR GAVIN HUNMA BSC COMPUTING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JAIDEORAO HUNMA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MADAN HARREE FCCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MANIRAM PANDOO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.45k | £5.42k | £5.05k | £7.25k | £7.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.61k | £3.38k | £4.37k | £3.22k | £3.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 24 November 2024 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 31 December 2023 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 16 October 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 29 November 2021 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 18 October 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH MAY 2000 AND AMENDED ON OCTOBER 15TH 2000
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE MAURITIAN MARATHI RELIGION (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CULTURE OF MAURITIUS PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PERFORMANCE OF TRADITIONAL DANCING, SINGING, TALKS, DRAMAS AND OTHER TRADITIONAL MAURITIAN EVENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 FIRS PARK GARDENS
WINCHMORE HILL
LONDON
N21 2PX
- Phone:
- 02082454727
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window