DUKES BARN COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Dukes Barn centre provides residential outdoor activities for people with disabilities in the High Peak.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 20 July 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTONY ROBERT ELEY | Chair |
|
||||||
Judith Ann Irons | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Marie Lindholm | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
George Dean | Trustee | 14 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy John Fish | Trustee | 13 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS WOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £421.44k | £243.40k | £235.02k | £474.68k | £434.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £466.52k | £295.04k | £299.25k | £481.03k | £455.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £93.75k | £424 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 JULY 2000 as amended on 30 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE AND IN PARTICULAR: 1. TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING PHYSICAL AND SOCIAL TRAINING) SPECIFICALLY BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO CHILDREN AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO ARE DEAF OR WHOSE HEARING IS IMPAIRED OR WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ANY MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY, SICKNESS DISEASE OR INFIRMITY 2. TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING PHYSICAL AND SOCIAL TRAINING) OF CHILDREN AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SKILLS AND METHODS OF COMMUNICATING WITH THE DEAF AND 3. RELIEVING THE HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS SUFFERED BY CHILDREN AND MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO ARE DEAF OR WHOSE HEARING IS IMPAIRED OR WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM ANY MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY HANDICAP SICKNESS DISEASE OR INFIRMITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dukes Barn
School Lane
Beeley
Matlock
DE4 2NU
- Phone:
- 01629733039
- Email:
- info@dukesbarn.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window