CHILDREN OF FIJI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance education, health and welfare and to relieve poverty of children in Fiji
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Fiji
Governance
- 07 September 2000: Standard registration
- FIJI CHILDREN'S CHARITY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ella Natasha Barks | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
DR PETER MICHAEL LONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET JEAN LONG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/01/2020 | 14/01/2021 | 14/01/2022 | 14/01/2023 | 14/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.53k | £6.82k | £5.17k | £5.12k | £7.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.59k | £1.52k | £7.21k | £10.66k | £8.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 January 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 January 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 January 2022 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 January 2021 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 January 2020 | 16 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED 17 AUGUST 2000 AND 29 OCTOBER 2002.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM TO THE FOLLOWING OBJECT ("THE OBJECT") IN FIJI TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, HEALTH AND WELFARE AND RELIEVE POVERTY OF CHILDREN IN FIJI.
Area of benefit
CHILDREN IN FIJI.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 SOUTH DRIVE
CATTISTOCK
DORCHESTER
DT2 0JG
- Phone:
- 01300320433
- Email:
- longs@dynamicduo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window