KNIGHTWOOD KIDS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
After School Club held at Knightwood Primary School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 31 July 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Helen Chapman | Chair | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Louise Van Hateren | Trustee | 28 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.77k | £78.87k | £114.56k | £108.64k | £117.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.78k | £96.60k | £124.83k | £114.44k | £94.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £3.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 25 MAY 2000.
Charitable objects
A) TO PROVIDE THE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS. B) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PERSONS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH CARE, EDUCATION AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NORTH BADDESLEY, HAMPSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
KNIGHTWOOD PRIMARY SCHOOL
BELLFLOWER WAY
CHANDLER'S FORD
EASTLEIGH
SO53 4HW
- Phone:
- 07850692091
- Email:
- julie.knightwood@icloud.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window